Accounts and annual returns DILTON MARSH COMMUNITY DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1039458
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 09 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 22 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 01 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 25 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required