THE BOOK AID CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to distribute Bibles and Christian books supplied by donors and supporters of the trust for the advancement of the Christian religion, public benefit or education and the relief of the aged, poor, sick or disabled either in the UK or overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cameroon
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Philippines
- Scotland
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 July 1994: Standard registration
- BOOK AID (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW QUINNEY | Chair | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan Charles Paddock | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pauline Bellingham | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Bonwick | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT IAN BRADSHAW | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.77k | £291.57k | £318.96k | £292.58k | £282.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.17k | £254.54k | £294.86k | £318.04k | £345.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.55k | £61.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1.GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION OR OTHER EDUCATION 4.THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED.
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Book Aid
Bromley House
Kangley Bridge Road
LONDON
SE26 5AQ
- Phone:
- 02087782145
- Email:
- office@book-aid.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window