MENITH WOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running and maintaining our village hall. Organising village events. Representing the views of villagers to outside bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 18 July 1994: Standard registration
- OLD CHAPEL HALL MENITH WOOD (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN GITTINS | Chair | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Claire Howitt | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Worsley | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Buckley | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE HUDSON | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANITA WITHEY | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA BUSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACY LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.70k | £12.51k | £12.11k | £2.26k | £2.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.48k | £1.25k | £10.69k | £11.46k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.53k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 7 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF MENITHWOOD IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE MENITH WOOD HEREFORD AND WORCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charlbury House
Menith Wood
Worcester
WR6 6UN
- Phone:
- 01584881444
- Email:
- kevin.gittins@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window