SRI MATHA SHRUTHI LAYA KSHETHRRAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims and Objectives: To create an awareness of Indian classical music in the UK. To promote Indian classical music & fusion among the other ethnic groups, which will help create a better understanding between different ethnicities. To provide an outlet for youngsters with creative talents, thus building their self-confidence and broadening their scope of interest. Provide a safe space for inter-a
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Total income includes £26,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 July 1994: Standard registration
- 09 August 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 January 2012: Re-registered
- INSTITUTE OF FINE ARTS (Working name)
- INSTITUTE OF FINE ARTS (SHRUTHI LAYA SHANGHAM) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VINAYK BHARRATHANN | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUVARNATHASH SAMARAKKODY | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rathiya Karthikeyan | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £8.11k | £17.14k | £7.55k | £42.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.60k | £9.33k | £21.93k | £28.02k | £49.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 719 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 719 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14.12.1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN INDIAN CLASSICAL MUSIC DANCE DRAMA AND ART
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE, GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
406 - 408 LEWISHAM HIGH ST
SE13 6LJ
1st floor, 25 High st
BELOWBAR
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 2DF
- Phone:
- 02380638995
- Email:
- ram@instituteoffinearts.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window