KINGSTON CARERS' NETWORK

Charity number: 1039508
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SUPPORT CARERS OF PERSONS WHO LIVE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013

Total income: £301,870
Total expenditure: £299,954

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1994: Standard registration
  • 23 October 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 23 October 2013: Funds transferred to 1151456 KINGSTON CARERS' NETWORK
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £148.38k £131.33k £256.16k £255.82k £301.87k
Total expenditure £136.46k £170.98k £227.36k £227.40k £299.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 21 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 21 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 14 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 26 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 31 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 31 January 2011 On Time