SWINDON PEGASUS BRASS BAND SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has continued to educate the public in the art of brass band playing by holding concerts, carolling and entering contests to which the public has access.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 July 1994: Standard registration
- 26 August 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 26 August 2020: Funds transferred to 1130127 Great Western Youth and Brunel Brass Bands
- SWINDON PEGASUS BRASS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.50k | £12.86k | £16.17k | £9.13k | £8.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.57k | £10.79k | £14.21k | £15.34k | £7.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 13 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 12 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 01 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 24 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 7 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING , AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE SAID ART BY PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES. TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window