Financial history HOLY TRINITY PLAYGROUP (ASHBY DE-LA-ZOUCH)

Charity number: 1039542
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £145.37k £121.39k £152.67k £159.61k £154.26k
Total expenditure £118.86k £114.19k £136.13k £146.53k £162.22k
Income from government contracts £115.05k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.30k £5.24k N/A £118.31k