Trustees HOLY TRINITY PLAYGROUP (ASHBY DE-LA-ZOUCH)
Charity number: 1039542

Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Bailey | Chair | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Roe | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Harrold | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Norton | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Baker | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rose | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuk Yee Tsui | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kendal Reynolds-Khan | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Claire Cockram | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE CONIBEAR | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Newborough | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.