WINFRITH PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AGE 2 TO 5 YEARS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £70,044 from 18 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 July 1994: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 February 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Harding | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sealey | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joy Allan | Trustee | 23 September 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.14k | £57.01k | £64.33k | £88.58k | £99.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.47k | £46.28k | £69.26k | £77.12k | £103.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £28.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.77k | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2024 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 May 2024 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 September 2022 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 September 2022 | 456 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winfrith Pre-school
School Lane
Winfrith Newburgh
Dorchester
Dorchester
Dorset
- Phone:
- 01305 851877
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window