Accounts and annual returns MODBURY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1039616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 September 2023 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 September 2023 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window