Undershaw Education Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement & promotion of health, relief of poverty, advancement of education to special needs children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,947,158
Donations and legacies | £93.73k | |
Charitable activities | £3.79m | |
Other trading activities | £66.65k | |
Investments | £87 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,582,491
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.58m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,714,132 from 3 government contract(s) and £32,399 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.58m | |
Retained for future use | £364.67k |
People

75 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 July 1994: Standard registration
- 21 December 2022: Funds received from 900257 FRIENDS OF HIGH HURLANDS CHILDREN
- CSB SELF HELP FUND / STEPPING STONES SCHOOL / NATIONAL HEMIPLEGIA ORGANISATION (Working name)
- C S B SELF HELP FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- STEPPING STONES SCHOOL HINDHEAD LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Gerring | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA CHARLES | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Nicky Birchwood | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Robards | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Oliver Jones | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Stone | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Chesworth | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leilah Sheridan | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Karlsen | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Heath | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Felicia Cookson | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Pickford | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.86m | £3.03m | £3.41m | £3.32m | £3.95m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.39m | £2.79m | £3.25m | £3.14m | £3.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.38m | £2.85m | £3.18m | £3.09m | £3.71m | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.85k | £54.69k | £126.62k | £40.18k | £32.40k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £388.44k | £96.02k | £80.25k | £123.06k | £93.73k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £28.74k | £14.57k | £23.02k | £64.14k | £66.65k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.44m | £2.92m | £3.31m | £3.13m | £3.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £294 | £248 | £96 | £64 | £87 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.39m | £2.79m | £3.25m | £3.14m | £3.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.00k | £7.00k | £7.00k | £6.72k | £6.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £88.50k | £716.11k | £683.98k | £774.81k | £742.61k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.05m | £1.45m | £1.95m | £1.44m | £1.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £385.02k | £1.17m | £1.48m | £884.18k | £420.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2015 as amended on 12 May 2021
Charitable objects
1(A) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE (B) TO ASSIST OTHER ESTABLISHED CHATITIES WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THE COMPANY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stepping Stones School
Undershaw
Portsmouth Road
HINDHEAD
GU26 6AQ
- Phone:
- 01428 609953
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window