Financial history ST ANDREWS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1039631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.71k £7.35k £4.41k £9.07k £7.35k
Total expenditure £4.03k £7.33k £3.50k £5.06k £5.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A