Financial history FRIENDS OF SWING GATE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13.54k £9.85k £17.80k £14.93k £12.44k
Total expenditure £9.08k £18.49k £17.69k £10.54k £19.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k £1.90k N/A