Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST CUTHBERT MAYNE SCHOOL TORQUAY

Charity number: 1039645
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 March 2025 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 March 2025 622 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2022 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required