Financial history FRIENDS OF BARNHAM BROOM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.82k £2.70k £1.83k £2.26k £2.91k
Total expenditure £255 £163 £990 £3.79k £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A