THE HOLLIES CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an over sixty's club, who just play dominoes and bingo, have days out and go to dinners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 22 July 1994: Standard registration
- THE HOLLIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACK CARRINGTON | Chair | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Edward Evans | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CARRINGTON | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEAN COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BETTY TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MADGE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.77k | £1.35k | £1.78k | £1.70k | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £1.12k | £922 | £983 | £2.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF STAVELEY
Area of benefit
STAVELEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 BRIDLE ROAD
WOODTHORPE
MASTIN MOOR
CHESTERFIELD
S43 3BY
- Phone:
- 01246476762
- Email:
- irisevans80@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window