Accounts and annual returns DRAKE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1039696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 March 2025 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 March 2025 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2022 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1501 days