ST MARY'S CEVC PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1039699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Discos, Summer Fairs, Christmas Fairs, Uniform sales

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £13,882
Total expenditure: £7,758

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARYS V C PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenny Ashworth Chair 22 March 2023
None on record
SARAH BALLANTINE Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Alice Catherine Gordon Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.22k £4.05k £3.95k £7.53k £13.88k
Total expenditure £5.94k £2.12k £776 £9.11k £7.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Primary School
Oakfield Road
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA6 7LX
Phone:
01278422691