FRIENDS OF HOBLETTS MANOR SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise fundraising and social events for the school community at the Hobletts Manor Schools in Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 July 1994: Standard registration
- 09 February 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 February 2019: Re-registered
- FRIENDS OF HOBLETTS INFANTS + NURSERY (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF HOBLETTS MANOR INFANTS (Working name)
- HOBLETTS MANOR INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Sweeney | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Shelock | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sizmur | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rooney | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.16k | £4.40k | £3.17k | £775 | £11.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £4.61k | £6.56k | £1.02k | £4.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2009 as amended on 14 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOLS; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOLS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hobletts Manor Schools
Adeyfield Road
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP25JS
- Phone:
- 07731651251
- Email:
- FOHMS@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window