Accounts and annual returns HAINFORD FIRST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1039732
Charity reporting is overdue by 1806 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 345 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 345 days
Annual return 01 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 711 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 711 days
Annual return 01 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1076 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1076 days
Annual return 01 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1441 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1441 days
Annual return 01 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1806 days
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1806 days