HAINFORD FIRST SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VILLAGE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 July 1994: Standard registration
- HAINFORD VC FIRST SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CHRISTOPHER ENGELSEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARION STOKOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ELLIOTT-HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
R CHRISTOPHER GETHING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA FLORENCE MARKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE CHURCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA JULIE NOBBS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.22k | £5.00k | £5.64k | £11.04k | £10.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.44k | £5.85k | £6.67k | £2.37k | £1.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1439 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1439 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1804 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1804 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF HAINFORD VC FIRST SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAINFORD PRIMARY PARTNERSHIP SCHOOL
NEWTON ROAD
HAINFORD
NORWICH
NR10 3BQ
- Phone:
- 01603898359
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window