THE ST. ANDREW'S NETHER WALLOP CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust raises funds to provide grants to St Andrew's Parochial Church Council for the restoration, preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement and beautification of the church of St Andrew's, Nether Wallop, Hampshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 July 1994: Standard registration
- ST ANDREW'S NETHER WALLOP CHURCH BUILDING TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES JONATHAN BLACKBURN | Chair | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MAUREEN ADDISON | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER STUART MONRO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KARIN MARY BLANDFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £2.91k | £5.55k | £5.47k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £452 | £4.36k | £1.31k | £5.12k | £17.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE CHURCH OF ST. ANDREW'S NETHER WALLOP ("THE CHURCH") IN THE DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER AND THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE SAID COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND THE SAID DIOCESE TO PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING DECLARED REDUNDANT BY A PASTORAL MEASURE 1983 (OR ANY STATUTORY MODIFICATION OR RE-ENACTMENT THEREOF) OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD BELONG THERETO.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NETHER WALLOP, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Collingdale
Heathman Street
Nether Wallop
Stockbridge
SO20 8EW
- Phone:
- 01264781395
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window