WOKINGHAM JOB SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to job seekers resident in the Wokingham Borough and Bracknell Town. Services include advice on finding a job, writing a CV and preparing for a job interview. Clients have access a library and can use the Internet. The service is free to clients with costs covered by sponsorship from Wokingham Borough Council, other town and parish councils in the district and other donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,300 from 12 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 July 1994: Standard registration
- W J S C (Working name)
- WJSC (Working name)
- WOKINGHAM JOB SUPPORT CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Robert Stainton | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Haydn Middleton | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Clare Louise Lee | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Mitchell | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Vincent MacNaughton | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Newbold | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.49k | £26.26k | £26.59k | £26.07k | £29.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.51k | £25.21k | £27.77k | £26.97k | £31.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.40k | £25.15k | £26.25k | £25.15k | £28.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 1994, 8 JULY 1996, 16 JULY 2008 AND 22 JULY 2010 as amended on 07 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN WOKINGHAM AND DISTRICT WHO ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE SUPERVISED PROVISION OF SERVICES AND FACILITIES NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED BY THE EMPLOYMENT SERVICE.
Area of benefit
WOKINGHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CORNERSTONE
NORREYS AVENUE
WOKINGHAM
BERKSHIRE
RG40 1UE
- Phone:
- 01189770517
- Email:
- jobsearch@wjsc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window