Accounts and annual returns CLEVEDON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1039810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 April 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 April 2023 452 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required