WELSH HIGHLAND RAILWAY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Welsh Highland Railway Ltd operates a narrow gauge steam railway in Porthmadog in order to revive and preserve the spirit of the original railway that closed in 1937. The charity owns, maintains and operates Russell, the sole surviving steam engine from the original railway, now over 100 years old, together with other heritage rolling stock and artefacts. A new museum building opened in 2009.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 28 July 1994: Standard registration
- WELSH HIGHLAND RAILWAY (Working name)
- WELSH HIGHLAND RAILWAY (PORTHMADOG) (Working name)
- WHR (Working name)
- WELSH HIGHLAND LIGHT RAILWAY (1964) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM FARR | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicholas John Cutmore | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Samuel Mann | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pell | Trustee | 28 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Herbert | Trustee | 28 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mattocks Chapman | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GEORGE WENTWORTH CURRIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Alexander Sinclair | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.53k | £84.48k | £114.97k | £187.17k | £157.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.17k | £95.20k | £74.78k | £128.89k | £142.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.50k | £17.50k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30 JANUARY 1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 MAY 1994 AND AMENDED 25 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 26 JUNE 2004 as amended on 28 Jul 2007
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONCERNING RAILWAYS AND (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OPERATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING LIFE
Area of benefit
GWYNEDD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Welsh Highland Railway Ltd
The Station Building
PORTHMADOG
LL49 9DY
- Phone:
- 01766 513402
- Email:
- admin@whr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window