DORCHESTER AND WEST DORSET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dorchester & West Dorset District Scout Council is responsible for providing Scouting for both boys and girls 6 to 25 in Dorchester and surrounding towns and villages in West Dorset. A structured programme of activities is designed to help youngsters with the guidance of trained adult leaders to achieve their full potential as individuals, responsible citizens and members of their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
278 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 August 1994: Standard registration
- 08 October 2019: Funds received from 297176 CROSSWAYS SCOUT GROUP
- DORCHESTER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allen Northover | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Wellman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Wellman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Hillier | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Nicholas Cunliffe | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise St Barbe Baker | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frederick John Mackey | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Neil Spencer Edwards | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jared Parkin | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY WRAIGHT | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN LING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.53k | £150.15k | £103.39k | £87.73k | £140.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.72k | £50.61k | £123.79k | £59.59k | £64.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.34k | £9.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Stanier Road
Preston
WEYMOUTH
DT3 6PD
- Phone:
- 07919618614
- Email:
- treasurerdwdscouts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window