JAMES THOMPSON'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing equipment and other items, services and facilities for and thereby advance education at any school in the Parish of Waddingham, Lincs, or by which that parish is substantially served. Advancing the education of young persons under 25 years of age who are resident in the said parish and are in need of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 July 1994: Standard registration
- WADDINGHAM ENDOWMENT TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID THOMAS WAITE | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|||||
GODFREY ALLEN THACKER | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Brian Milton B A | Trustee |
|
||||||
DENNIS ARTHUR MACDONALD CHURCHILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW CLARKSON DUNSMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.91k | £7.14k | £7.22k | £7.56k | £7.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.61k | £7.51k | £7.50k | £7.85k | £8.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
(1) IN PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR AND THEREBY ADVANCE EDUCATION AT ANY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF WADDINGHAM OR BY WHICH THAT PARISH IS SUBSTANTIALLY SERVED (2) IN OTHERWISE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF YOUNG PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE SAID PARISH AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WADDINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH VIEW
MOOR ROAD
SNITTERBY
GAINSBOROUGH
DN21 4TT
- Phone:
- 01673818314
- Email:
- brianmilton31@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window