Trustees BRISTOL RECORD SOCIETY
Charity number: 1039843

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charlotte Jane Berry | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Pohl FRHistSoc | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Aylmer Coates FSA SFHEA | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John George Reeks | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Nigel Malpass | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard George Stone | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathleen Lillian Thompson FSA FRHisS | Trustee | 14 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Barry | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ROGER LEECH FSA MIFA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr EVAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.