NEWPORT GRAMMAR SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the education of persons under 25 years and in exceptional circumstances those under 40 years who are resident in the Isle of Wight by providing assistance in such ways as the Trustees think fit. The Charity makes grants following receipt of detailed application form from individuals and local organizations working with young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 02 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jonathan Chave Nainby-Luxmoore DL | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Charles Piers Egerton-Warburton | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Colin Kenneth Samuelson | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
James Robert Woodward Attrill DL | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Graeme Bowen | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
GILLIAN FRANCES BURNETT | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|||||||
JOHN IRWIN BARNIKEL | Trustee | 12 August 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.08k | £25.56k | £21.76k | £21.59k | £27.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.22k | £18.14k | £13.16k | £17.19k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2022 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2022 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATING SCHEME SEALED 3 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 7 NOV 2007.
Charitable objects
1) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT (PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN NEWPORT OR GODSHILL) AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERAILTY OF THE FOREGOING - (A) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES. (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 2) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NEWPORT OR GODSHILL, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oaklands
Park Road
Wootton
RYDE
Isle of Wight
PO33 4RL
- Phone:
- 01983884198
- Email:
- gillian@rburnett.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window