ROTARY CLUB OF CHEPSTOW AND DISTRICT TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises events within the area of operation with the intention of raising funds to be used for local and Rotary Charities. Donations are made to Organisations and Individuals with approval granted by the Council of the Rotary Club of Chepstow at its monthly meetings. Individual members of the Club from time to time give freely of their time to assist with local community projects and concerns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 02 August 1994: Standard registration
- ROTARY CLUB OF CHEPSTOW TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY CHARLES ERNEST SUMNER | Trustee | 03 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KENNETH SANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN RICHARD GEORGE SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.21k | £2.33k | £8.42k | £16.80k | £15.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.83k | £1.97k | £6.32k | £16.38k | £14.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JUNE 1994, AS AMENDED 1 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19A SEYMOUR AVENUE
PARC SEYMOUR
PENHOW
CALDICOT
NP26 3AG
- Phone:
- 01633400158
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window