Financial history THE PUDDENECKS CLUB

Charity Number: 1039897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.44k £14.67k £23.18k £32.17k £34.21k
Total expenditure £24.24k £18.09k £23.05k £32.12k £34.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A