Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NORTH CURRY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1039906
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 November 2024 493 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 November 2021 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 January 2021 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required