Financial history TUNBRIDGE WELLS COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity Number: 1039911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £250.21k £229.31k £301.83k £265.59k £343.55k
Total expenditure £213.44k £237.69k £286.98k £302.14k £310.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.70k N/A