NORTH TAUNTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1039932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting offers challenge and adventure to 400,000 young people and 100,000 adults across the UK. We believe in helping our Members fulfil their potential by working in teams, learning by doing and thinking for themselves. We give people of every background the chance to stretch themselves, learn new skills and make life long friends.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,778
Total expenditure: £10,137

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 August 1994: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 19 September 2013: Re-registered
  • 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 25 September 2016: Re-registered
  • 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 10 September 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Williams Chair 17 October 2024
None on record
Laura Emily Polley Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Alison Jane Hartnell Trustee 05 June 2024
None on record
Sarah Milsted Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Marian Joan Scott Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Bhuvnesh Bhalla Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Thomas Michael Cridland Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.22k £4.38k £5.72k £10.54k £9.78k
Total expenditure £8.80k £3.12k £5.50k £8.41k £10.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 March 2025 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scout Hut
St Andrews Rd
Taunton
Somerset
TA2 7BW
Phone:
01823 478125
Website:

No information available