RADIUS TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children with special educational needs by managing residential special schools for children with emotional & behavioural difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Total income:
£8,111,308
Donations and legacies | £9.20k | |
Charitable activities | £8.03m | |
Other trading activities | £57.05k | |
Investments | £14.12k | |
Other | £303 |
Total expenditure:
£8,654,414
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.65m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,880,120 from government contract(s) and £150,511 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.65m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Hampshire
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Wokingham
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 August 1994: Standard registration
- 13 November 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRANTRIDGE SCHOOL (Working name)
- GRAFHAM GRANGE SCHOOL (Working name)
- GRAFHAM GRANGE SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.81m | £5.61m | £7.97m | £8.70m | £8.11m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22m | £5.08m | £7.85m | £8.00m | £8.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.23m | £7.88m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £389.89k | £150.51k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.38k | £9.24k | £10.23k | £7.07k | £9.20k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £57.05k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.77m | £4.94m | £7.95m | £8.68m | £8.03m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £26.30k | £16.30k | £10.00k | £10.98k | £14.12k | |
|
Income - Other | £140 | £644.85k | £0 | £106 | £303 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.21m | £5.06m | £7.81m | £7.97m | £8.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.49k | £18.28k | £40.57k | £27.91k | £28.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.79m | £4.53m | £4.42m | £4.44m | £4.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.78m | £2.95m | £4.10m | £4.61m | £4.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.46m | -£1.43m | -£1.94m | -£2.14m | -£4.86m | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.11m | £2.80m | £3.68m | £3.49m | £3.31m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2015
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS BY MANAGING RESIDENTIAL SPECIAL SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN WITH EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES 2.TO PROMOTE THE SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY FROM INNER AND OUTER LONDON AND THE HOME COUNTIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND COUNSELLING TO FAMILIES/GUARDIANS OF SUCH CHILDREN SO AS THEY MAY BETTER UNDERSTAND THEIR EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
INNER AND OUTER LONDON AND HOME COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window