Governing document RADIUS TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2015
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS BY MANAGING RESIDENTIAL SPECIAL SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN WITH EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES 2.TO PROMOTE THE SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY FROM INNER AND OUTER LONDON AND THE HOME COUNTIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND COUNSELLING TO FAMILIES/GUARDIANS OF SUCH CHILDREN SO AS THEY MAY BETTER UNDERSTAND THEIR EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIOURAL DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
INNER AND OUTER LONDON AND HOME COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.