GRESHAM COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The College's main activity is the provision and administration of the Gresham Lectures given by the Gresham Professors in a tradition going back more than 400 years. The College also organises seminars and conferences and publishes papers in pursuance of the College's policy of re-interpreting 'the sharing of the new learning for free' which was Sir Thomas Gresham's intent, in contemporary terms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,920,491
Donations and legacies | £314.09k | |
Charitable activities | £1.55m | |
Other trading activities | £36.28k | |
Investments | £20.70k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,908,610
Raising funds | £96.80k | |
Charitable activities | £1.81m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £96.80k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.81m | |
Retained for future use | £11.88k |
People

16 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 04 August 1994: Standard registration
- GRESHAM COLLEGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert Allison CBE | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
Professor Christopher John Lintott | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Naresh Sonpar | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Raghavenda Rau | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nighat Qureishi | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Vincent Keaveny | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Vermont | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Edward Lord | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ahamed DOWSHAN Humzah | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Cale Matthews | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Denise Gurney | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
RAYMOND JOHN LONG CB | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DEBORAH CLARE WALKER-ARNOTT CBE | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £981.36k | £1.52m | £1.62m | £1.91m | £1.92m | |
|
Total expenditure | £971.37k | £1.20m | £1.61m | £1.92m | £1.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.68k | £46.51k | £75.11k | £231.45k | £314.09k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.67k | £7.43k | £30.72k | £50.78k | £36.28k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £937.97k | £1.47m | £1.51m | £1.63m | £1.55m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £40 | £4 | £113 | £2.94k | £20.70k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £971.37k | £1.17m | £1.51m | £1.82m | £1.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £23.62k | £94.36k | £100.29k | £96.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £44.18k | £24.15k | £41.36k | £32.27k | £77.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.76k | £17.47k | £9.56k | £34.68k | £29.42k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £558.21k | £900.48k | £937.93k | £931.31k | £965.51k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £233.60k | £259.46k | £477.18k | £506.45k | £523.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 1994 AMENDED (NAME CHANGE) 3 SEPTEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2007 as amended on 20 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF LECTURES, SEMINARS AND EDUCATIONAL CONTENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRESHAM COLLEGE
BARNARD'S INN HALL
HOLBORN
LONDON
EC1N 2HH
- Phone:
- 02078310575
- Email:
- enquiries@gresham.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window