Financial history THE SWAN YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1039966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £64.59k £42.80k £83.10k £119.44k £124.06k
Total expenditure £68.84k £40.21k £74.22k £105.37k £116.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.64k £44.26k £30.00k N/A