THE SWAN YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is to provide a safe, drug and alcohol free recreational facility for the young people of Berkhamsted and the surrounding area. The charity runs the Swan Youth Centre, the facilities of which include a large room in which events can be held, pool table, audio equipment, TV, games console, and bar selling soft drinks and snacks. Activities include after-school drop-in
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Wilcock Ashton | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Agnes Rognaldsen | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Maria Gratton Sindermann | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Rogers | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Freedman | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise Jacques | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Giovanna Swarbrick | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.59k | £42.80k | £83.10k | £119.44k | £124.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.84k | £40.21k | £74.22k | £105.37k | £116.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.64k | £44.26k | £30.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JULY 1994 as amended on 03 May 2023 as amended on 03 May 2023 as amended on 22 May 2023
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 AND 25 YEARS IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF DACORUM BOROUGH COUNCIL AS EXISTING ON 1 JANUARY 1994 ( AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO ARE HOMELESS OR OTHERWISE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AN INTEGRATED SYSTEM OF SHORT-TERM ACCOMODATION AND TRAINING COUPLED WITH ADVICE AND COUNSELLING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. ALL SUCH RELIEF AND FACILITIES TO BE AVAILABLE TO YOUNG PEOPLE WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE COLOUR OR CREED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF DACORUM BOROUGH COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
137-139 HIGH STREET
BERKHAMSTED
HERTFORDSHIRE
HP4 3HH
- Phone:
- 01442384349
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window