PRESTEIGNE FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs an annual music festival in Presteigne featuring works of living composers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 04 August 1994: Standard registration
- THE PRESTEIGNE FESTIVAL (Working name)
- MUSIC FESTIVALS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nathan James Dearden | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Alistair Trew | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lucy Lilley | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Nicholas Lane | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Louisa Baer Sullivan Hungate | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH THOMAS HATFIELD | Trustee | 19 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE VASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.73k | £102.15k | £158.47k | £170.70k | £138.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.98k | £112.74k | £149.13k | £167.84k | £144.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £38.00k | £59.60k | £1.25k | £1.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JANUARY 1995.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION ENJOYMENT AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF ARTS EVENTS IN PRESTEIGNE AND ELSEWHERE BOTH AS PART OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL AND AT OTHER TIMES OF THE YEAR
Area of benefit
PRESTEIGNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Leverett
Discoyd
Presteigne
LD8 2NW
- Phone:
- 01547560812
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window