Financial history THE HASKEL FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1039969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.11k £65.47k £62.62k £62.05k £67.05k
Total expenditure £145.86k £134.74k £195.66k £135.20k £114.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A