THE HASKEL FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity continued to use generated income to support designated Charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 1994: Standard registration
- THE LORD AND LADY HASKEL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD SIMON HASKEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN HASKEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.11k | £65.47k | £62.62k | £62.05k | £67.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.86k | £134.74k | £195.66k | £135.20k | £114.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO APPLY AND PAY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE FUND FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND OTHER PURPOSES WHICH PROVIDE BENEFIT TO THE COMMUNITY IN A WAY REGARDED AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 28
Turner House
26 Clevedon Road
TWICKENHAM
TW1 2TE
- Phone:
- 02089487711
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window