THE HEACHAM INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main objective is to raise funds through various activities to enhance the quality of the pupils time at school by providing extra equipment/trips/events when possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 08 August 1994: Standard registration
- HEACHAM COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Smith | Chair | 28 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Zoe Hilliard | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
India Hamblin | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Taylor | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sky Brockwell | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE JACKSON | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.93k | £1.06k | £24 | £571 | £911 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.73k | £3.01k | £2.73k | £1.91k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heacham Infant & Nursery School
School Road
Heacham
KING'S LYNN
PE31 7DQ
- Phone:
- 01485570357
- Website:
-
Heachaminfant.norfolk.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window