THE RYEDALE AND SCARBOROUGH CAT WELFARE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for helping with the relief of suffering of pregnant cats and kittens Ryedale & Scarborough Area only
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 August 1994: Standard registration
- RYEDALE AND SCARBOROUGH CAT WELFARE GROUP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENYS PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDITH MARGARET HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.11k | £3.51k | £2.22k | £3.70k | £4.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £3.01k | £2.79k | £4.16k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST CATS AND KITTENS TO RESCUE STRAY AND UNWANTED CATS AND KITTENS, INCLUDING FERAL CATS AND KITTENS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Stapleton Close
Seamer
SCARBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
YO12 4QW
- Phone:
- 07914767532
- Email:
- catsrscw@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window