Accounts and annual returns THE GAUSIA MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1040011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 27 March 2025 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 27 March 2025 420 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 13 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 13 March 2023 405 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 13 March 2023 770 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required