Financial history PERSHORE RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity number: 1040021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £996 £1.21k £31 £5.03k £3.49k
Total expenditure £626 £1.29k £1.57k £8.76k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A