THE TARPORLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is a local community centre offering various rooms/halls for meetings, private functions and a variety of other activities for all ages etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Total income includes £12,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 08 August 1994: Standard registration
- 25 May 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1194629 TARPORLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREA...
- TARPORLEY & DISTRICT COMMUNITY CENTRE & RECREATION GROUND CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.69k | £45.35k | £52.47k | £68.96k | £173.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.06k | £35.99k | £51.50k | £47.53k | £186.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £1.50k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 29 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 29 March 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TARPORLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DINSTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TARPORLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window