BOSTON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A choir of mixed voices, singing choral music of all kinds, presented to the public through concerts approximately 3 times a year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 August 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Baker | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Helen Watson | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Roberts | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Zahorski | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81k | £442 | £1.96k | £4.64k | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £142 | £3.74k | £4.39k | £5.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 1964 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 1965, 4 JUNE 1991, 30 JUNE 1994 , 17 JULY 2003 AND 6 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS AND BY OTHER SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daisy Cottage
Shore Road
Freiston
BOSTON
Lincolnshire
PE22 0LN
- Phone:
- 07817 595161
- Email:
- society@bostonchoral.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window