GUYANA DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT FOR THE ANGLICAN DIOCESE OF GUYANA WITHIN THE PROVINCE OF THE WEST INDIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Guyana
Governance
- 11 August 1994: Standard registration
- THE GUYANA DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Ann Brathwaite | Trustee | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
The Right Reverend Peter William Wheatley | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Roxanne Fay Hunte | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
THE REVEREND DOCTOR JOHN FIENNES TWISLETON SSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THE REVEREND CANON IVELAW ALEXANDER BOWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PHILIP NORMAN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.29k | £459 | £13 | £325 | £767 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £19 | £0 | £0 | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 May 2024 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2024 | 567 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2024 | 932 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 1994, AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1996.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESE OF GUYANA IN THE PROVINCE OF THE WEST INDIES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GUYANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 EVELYN COTTAGES
ABINGER LANE
ABINGER COMMON
DORKING
RH5 6JE
- Phone:
- 01306 730123
- Email:
- gillandphil@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window