Accounts and annual returns WHETSTONE ASSOCIATION FOR ST PETERS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1040103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 October 2021 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required